NY A08269 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - print number 8269a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - print number 8269a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2010 to November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authority of the county of Chautauqua to impose an additional 3/4% sales and use taxes; eliminates the reduction of such taxes to 1/2%.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2010 to November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authority of the county of Chautauqua to impose an additional 3/4% sales and use taxes; eliminates the reduction of such taxes to 1/2%.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | print number 8269a | |
2010-05-26 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-11 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S3301 (Same As) 2010-11-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3301B