NY A08250 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - print number 8250a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - print number 8250a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permits and financial security for reclamation for salt mining beneath a lake; requires such permits to be subject to environmental quality review procedures; requires financial security to cover any damages directly or indirectly resulting from salt mining activities beneath a lake, including, but not limited to, those resulting from collapse or water contamination.
Title
Relates to permits and financial security for reclamation for salt mining beneath a lake; requires such permits to be subject to environmental quality review procedures; requires financial security to cover any damages directly or indirectly resulting from salt mining activities beneath a lake, including, but not limited to, those resulting from collapse or water contamination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | print number 8250a |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-11-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07736 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - referred to environmental conservation