NY A08189 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system; establishes certain conditions relating to salary and compensation increases for certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system; establishes certain conditions relating to salary and compensation increases for certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.288 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1713 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6385 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.431 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.431 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06385 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.288