NY A08169 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - substituted by s5786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - substituted by s5786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the hotel or motel tax in the county of Oswego.
Title
Relates to the hotel or motel tax in the county of Oswego.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Assembly | substituted by s5786 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.737 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05786 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.224