NY A08165 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of the cystic fibrosis foundation license plate and cystic fibrosis research and education fund.
Title
Relates to the creation of the cystic fibrosis foundation license plate and cystic fibrosis research and education fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Asm. Janet Duprey [R] | Asm. Mark Gjonaj [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.111 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1554 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5637A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.284 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.284 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | print number 8165a |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05637 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8165A