NY A08159 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential health care facilities to provide notices to patients when a temporary operator has been appointed.
Title
Requires residential health care facilities to provide notices to patients when a temporary operator has been appointed.
Sponsors
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | approval memo.11 |
2018-12-07 | Senate | signed chap.401 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1814 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S766 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.587 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.266 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.266 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00766 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8159