NY A08149 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the disclosure of disabled tenants' rights to reasonable accommodations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the disclosure of disabled tenants' rights to reasonable accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-21Senate3RD READING CAL.411
2020-07-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6220A
2020-07-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-20Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.175
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.175
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-06-06Assemblyprint number 8149a
2019-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06220 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8149A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8149
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08149
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08149A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08149&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8149#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback