NY A08111 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "protection against unfair section 8 evictions (P.A.U.S.E.) act"; provides that in any case of public assistance where the municipality or section 8 refuses to pay the required portion of rent under any state, local or federal subsidy program due to building code violations or violations of the warranty of habitability pursuant to section two hundred thirty-five-b of the real property law, the tenant or lawful occupant of a dwelling shall not be required to pay his or her share under any state, local or federal subsidy program and shall not be subject to eviction summary proceedings for non-payment of rent or supplemental rent.
Title
Enacts the "protection against unfair section 8 evictions (P.A.U.S.E.) act"; provides that in any case of public assistance where the municipality or section 8 refuses to pay the required portion of rent under any state, local or federal subsidy program due to building code violations or violations of the warranty of habitability pursuant to section two hundred thirty-five-b of the real property law, the tenant or lawful occupant of a dwelling shall not be required to pay his or her share under any state, local or federal subsidy program and shall not be subject to eviction summary proceedings for non-payment of rent or supplemental rent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | print number 8111a |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07986 (Same As) 2024-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT