NY A08109 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement applications made by or on behalf of certain deputy sheriffs; ensures that a deputy sheriff who is disabled is not denied disability retirement benefits because they were unable to work in criminal law enforcement activities because of the disability at the date the application is filed.
Title
Relates to disability retirement applications made by or on behalf of certain deputy sheriffs; ensures that a deputy sheriff who is disabled is not denied disability retirement benefits because they were unable to work in criminal law enforcement activities because of the disability at the date the application is filed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.447 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1482 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5655 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.499 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.499 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | print number 8109a |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05655 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8109A