NY A08102 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | Senate | signed chap.164 |
2017-07-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1518 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6561 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 8102a |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06561 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8102A