NY A08096 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.332
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.332
Summary
To amend the Criminal Procedure Law permitting the electronic appearance of defendants in Putnam County.
Title
Permits the electronic appearance of a defendant in the county of Putnam.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.332 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.793 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5084 | |
2009-05-26 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-21 | advanced to third reading cal.637 | |
2009-05-19 | reported | |
2009-05-04 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05084 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.332
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08096&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |