NY A08082 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a gas or electrical corporation shall not consider the demand used by a volunteer fire company in responding to emergencies when calculating demand charges for the purposes of determining safe and adequate service.
Title
Provides that a gas or electrical corporation shall not consider the demand used by a volunteer fire company in responding to emergencies when calculating demand charges for the purposes of determining safe and adequate service.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Guillermo Linares [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | tabled |
2012-08-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.144 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1095 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4775A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8082a |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-04 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2012-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.277 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.579 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S04775 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8082A