NY A08081 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the stop civil discrimination act requiring proof of service to include the server's perception of certain characteristics of the person to whom personal service of a summons was delivered.
Title
Enacts the stop civil discrimination act requiring proof of service to include the server's perception of certain characteristics of the person to whom personal service of a summons was delivered.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Bores [D] | Asm. Grace Lee [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | print number 8081a |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2023-09-27 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07801 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY