NY A08046 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to items of appropriation.
Title
Relates to items of appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-09-27 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-09-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02062 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY