NY A08040 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to pay the Uniondale union free school district the full amount of state reimbursement to such district, notwithstanding the failure of the California Avenue school in such school district to be in session 180 days during the 2012 - 2013 school year.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to pay the Uniondale union free school district the full amount of state reimbursement to such district, notwithstanding the failure of the California Avenue school in such school district to be in session 180 days during the 2012 - 2013 school year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5781 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.666 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.666 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05781 (Same As) 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.419