NY A08025 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - print number 8025a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - print number 8025a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that academic credit toward a high school diploma be given for practical experience gained outside of school during high school.
Title
Requires that academic credit toward a high school diploma be given for practical experience gained outside of school during high school.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | print number 8025a |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02104 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - referred to education