NY A08022 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the role of the department of corrections and community supervision in planning and facilitating the discharge or release of incarcerated persons to the community.
Title
Relates to the role of the department of corrections and community supervision in planning and facilitating the discharge or release of incarcerated persons to the community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.284 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.740 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.740 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07229 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE