NY A08016 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would grant retroactive Tier 2 status in the New York State and Local Employees' Retirement System to Noreen A. Porfirio by deeming her to have been a member of such system on March 2, 1976.
Title
Grants tier 2 status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Noreen A. Porfirio.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Lopez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | held for consideration in governmental employees | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-05-01 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S4146 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS