NY A07991 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of professional medical conduct to post on its website information on patients' reporting rights regarding professional misconduct involving sexual harassment and assault; requires physicians' practice settings to post signage directing their patients to the office of professional medical conduct's website for information about their rights and how to report professional misconduct.
Title
Requires the office of professional medical conduct to post on its website information on patients' reporting rights regarding professional misconduct involving sexual harassment and assault; requires physicians' practice settings to post signage directing their patients to the office of professional medical conduct's website for information about their rights and how to report professional misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.203 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.485 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6678A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.403 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | print number 7991a |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06678 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.203