NY A07985 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to program six certified capital companies; relates to requirements for qualification for program six; relates to tax credits for such program; relates to the maximum amount of certified capital in such program.
Title
Relates to program six certified capital companies; relates to requirements for qualification for program six; relates to tax credits for such program; relates to the maximum amount of certified capital in such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | tabled |
2011-12-12 | Senate | vetoed memo.83 |
2011-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1357 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5587C |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.497 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.497 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7985b |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | print number 7985a |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05587 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7985B