NY A07979 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Waterford, in the county of Saratoga to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan and the additional pension benefit plan for members of the optional twenty year retirement plan to police officer Michael Shudt.
Title
Authorizes the town of Waterford, in the county of Saratoga to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan and the additional pension benefit plan for members of the optional twenty year retirement plan to police officer Michael Shudt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5779 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.686 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05779 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.354