NY S05779 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Waterford, in the county of Saratoga to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan and the additional pension benefit plan for members of the optional twenty year retirement plan to police officer Michael Shudt.
Title
Authorizes the town of Waterford, in the county of Saratoga to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan and the additional pension benefit plan for members of the optional twenty year retirement plan to police officer Michael Shudt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.354 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.686 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7979 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1644 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07979 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5779