NY A07978 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the fee charged for the issuance of birth and death certificates.
Title
Relates to the fee charged for the issuance of birth and death certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to health |