NY A07969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Title
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7969b |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7969a |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06103 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to higher education