NY A07952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6269a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6269a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects certain lands in the towns of Blooming Grove and Chester, Orange county, acquired for a public use by the commissioners of the Palisades Interstate park, exclusive of improvements erected thereon by the state, to real property taxation; applies to assessment rolls prepared on the basis of taxable status dates occurring on or after the date on which this act becomes law.
Title
Subjects certain lands in the towns of Blooming Grove and Chester, Orange county, acquired for a public use by the commissioners of the Palisades Interstate park, exclusive of improvements erected thereon by the state, to real property taxation; applies to assessment rolls prepared on the basis of taxable status dates occurring on or after the date on which this act becomes law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6269a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.314 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-11-06 | Assembly | print number 7952a |
2017-11-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06269 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.314