NY A07951 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - approval memo.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - approval memo.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "public employee whistleblower protection act"; repeals certain provisions of the civil service law related to early disclosure for certain alleged violations of certain public employees.
Title
Enacts the "public employee whistleblower protection act"; repeals certain provisions of the civil service law related to early disclosure for certain alleged violations of certain public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | Senate | approval memo.39 |
2015-12-28 | Senate | signed chap.585 |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4628 |
2015-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.430 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04628 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7951