NY A07949 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.447
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.447
Summary
Authorizes the superintendent of insurance to approve a demonstration program under which an eligible insurer issues group health insurance policies to eligible associations.
Title
Authorizes the superintendent of insurance to approve a demonstration program under which an eligible insurer issues group health insurance policies to eligible associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | signed chap.447 | |
2009-09-04 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.855 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4602A | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 | |
2009-06-16 | rules report cal.351 | |
2009-06-16 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-04 | print number 7949a | |
2009-06-04 | amend and recommit to insurance | |
2009-04-28 | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04602 (Same As) 2009-09-16 - signed chap.447
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07949&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |