NY A07948 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authority of the county of Ulster to impose an additional 1 percent sales and compensating use tax; provides that provisions of this act shall only take effect if the county of Ulster on January 1, 2015 assumes the entire cost of all local elections located within such county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authority of the county of Ulster to impose an additional 1 percent sales and compensating use tax; provides that provisions of this act shall only take effect if the county of Ulster on January 1, 2015 assumes the entire cost of all local elections located within such county.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2013-06-14Assemblyprint number 7948a
2013-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2013-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback