NY A07928 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing a person having a lawful order of custody of a child to make medical decisions for such child.
Title
Relates to allowing a person having a lawful order of custody of a child to make medical decisions for such child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.873 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | reference changed to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06015 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES