NY A07928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4762a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4762a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces from 20 to 10, the number of hours of part-time work needed by employees for employer qualification for the New York youth works tax credit.
Title
Reduces from 20 to 10, the number of hours of part-time work needed by employees for employer qualification for the New York youth works tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4762a |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.657 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.657 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7928a |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04762 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.536