NY A07923 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-12 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-12 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Rensselaer as the "Rensselaer County Purple Heart Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Rensselaer as the "Rensselaer County Purple Heart Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-12 | Assembly | signed chap.498 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1359 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6562A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.315 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7923a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06562 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7923A