NY A07913 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - print number 7913a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - print number 7913a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to establish at least 4 infant recovery centers in areas of need for infants suffering from drug withdrawal as a result of in utero exposure.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to establish at least 4 infant recovery centers in areas of need for infants suffering from drug withdrawal as a result of in utero exposure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Assembly | print number 7913a |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02815 (Same As) 2018-02-20 - PRINT NUMBER 2815A