NY A07840 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - print number 7840a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - print number 7840a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to grants for mental illness and chemical dependence treatment services during the pendency of a medical assistance eligibility determination.
Title
Relates to grants for mental illness and chemical dependence treatment services during the pendency of a medical assistance eligibility determination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | print number 7840a |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05210 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5210A