NY A07822 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s3959b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s3959b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent representative on various transportation authorities.
Title
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent representative on various transportation authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s3959b |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7822c |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.130 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7822b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7822a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03959 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.86