NY A07817 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - substituted by s5157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - substituted by s5157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the dissolution of the Oswego City Library created on April 15, 1854 and allows for the redistribution of any funds and or assets held by such library to the Oswego School District Public Library.
Title
Relates to the dissolution of the Oswego City Library created on April 15, 1854 and allows for the redistribution of any funds and or assets held by such library to the Oswego School District Public Library.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s5157 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.151 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.151 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S05157 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.480