NY A07813 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6756a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6756a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the city of Fulton to discontinue its use of certain waterfront parklands.
Title
Relates to authorizing the city of Fulton to discontinue its use of certain waterfront parklands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6756a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | print number 7813a |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06756 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.187