NY A07804 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5322a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5322a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to all plumbing and electrical work performed on school buildings in Nassau or Suffolk county.
Title
Relates to all plumbing and electrical work performed on school buildings in Nassau or Suffolk county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5322a |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.446 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | print number 7804a |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05322 (Same As) 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.582