NY A07796 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office for the aging to develop materials and guidelines for the development of community-based programs to encourage the development of activities and programs that support older adults within communities.
Title
Directs the office for the aging to develop materials and guidelines for the development of community-based programs to encourage the development of activities and programs that support older adults within communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.301 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1931 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6681 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06681 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7796