NY A07791 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s5216c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s5216c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Feed My Sheep Church located in the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Feed My Sheep Church located in the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted by s5216c |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.575 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.575 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7791b |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | print number 7791a |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05216 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.352