NY A07780 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suspension or demotion upon abolition or reduction of positions for labor class titles; provides that an incumbent in titles in the labor class that have taken the exam and been promoted to the position of a permanent incumbent, who is suspended or displaced upon abolition or reduction in positions, shall displace incumbents serving in the next lower occupied title in the labor class.
Title
Relates to suspension or demotion upon abolition or reduction of positions for labor class titles; provides that an incumbent in titles in the labor class that have taken the exam and been promoted to the position of a permanent incumbent, who is suspended or displaced upon abolition or reduction in positions, shall displace incumbents serving in the next lower occupied title in the labor class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | tabled |
2012-08-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.142 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1015 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7443 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.263 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.490 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.490 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7780b |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7780a |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07443 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7780B