NY A07773 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6110b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6110b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Oceanside Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Oceanside Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6110b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.508 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7773a |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06110 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.262