NY A07769 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain for-profit institutions to make annual reports to the commissioner of education and requires the commissioner to make such reports publicly available.
Title
Requires certain for-profit institutions to make annual reports to the commissioner of education and requires the commissioner to make such reports publicly available.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 7769 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7769a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05799 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION