NY A07769 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the reference to "inmate" when referring to residents of veteran's administration hospitals for purposes of absentee voting.
Title
Eliminates the reference to "inmate" when referring to residents of veteran's administration hospitals for purposes of absentee voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.585 |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04911 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS