NY A07767 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - print number 7767a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - print number 7767a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for at least one-third of required clinical training and competency for licensing as a registered professional nurse, licensed practical nurse, and nurse practitioner to be completed through simulation experience.
Title
Allows for at least one-third of required clinical training and competency for licensing as a registered professional nurse, licensed practical nurse, and nurse practitioner to be completed through simulation experience.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | print number 7767a |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06717 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to higher education