NY A07757 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6256a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6256a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to temporary manufacturing permits; makes permanent certain provisions of law relating to such permits; repeals certain provisions of law relating to temporary permits.
Title
Relates to temporary manufacturing permits; makes permanent certain provisions of law relating to such permits; repeals certain provisions of law relating to temporary permits.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6256a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.730 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.730 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06256 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.709