NY S06256 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.709
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.709
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to temporary manufacturing permits; makes permanent certain provisions of law relating to such permits; repeals certain provisions of law relating to temporary permits.
Title
Relates to temporary manufacturing permits; makes permanent certain provisions of law relating to such permits; repeals certain provisions of law relating to temporary permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.709 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.730 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7757 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1262 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6256A |
2021-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07757 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6256a