NY A07745 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.547
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.547
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if a run-off primary election is required in the city of New York, it shall be held on the third Tuesday next succeeding the date on which the initial primary election was held; requires the transmission of information regarding such elected officials be delivered to the secretary of state within 30 days of the general election; further addresses military voters.
Title
Provides that if a run-off primary election is required in the city of New York, it shall be held on the third Tuesday next succeeding the date on which the initial primary election was held; requires the transmission of information regarding such elected officials be delivered to the secretary of state within 30 days of the general election; further addresses military voters.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.547 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.66 |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.66 |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-12 | Assembly | print number 7745a |
2017-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |