NY A07745 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.148
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.148
Summary
This bill extends the time frame and amount in which the Town of Deer- park in the County of Orange may issue bonds and bond anticipation notes to liquidate an accumulated deficit in its general and highway funds.
Title
Extends authorization for the town of Deerpark to issue serial bonds for the specific object or purpose of liquidating the accumulated deficits in its general fund and highway fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.148 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.464 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4825A | |
2009-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-11 | home rule request | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.207 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-05 | print number 7745a | |
2009-05-05 | amend and recommit to local governments | |
2009-04-23 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S60407 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65006 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S04825 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7745A
S65006 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S04825 (Same As) 2009-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7745A
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07745&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |