NY A07737 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-25 - print number 7737a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-25 - print number 7737a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to establish a demonstration program imposing liability on owners of motor vehicles found to be in violation of the maximum speed limit or the maximum school speed limit of the city through the use of a speed limit photo device which combines speed sensing technology which determines the speed of a vehicle and captures/records that date by photographic, microphotographic, video tape or other recording system and produces an image of a motor vehicle at the moment that it exceeds the speed limit; provides for the expiration of this demonstration program five years after the effective date.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to establish a demonstration program imposing liability on owners of motor vehicles found to be in violation of the maximum speed limit or the maximum school speed limit of the city through the use of a speed limit photo device which combines speed sensing technology which determines the speed of a vehicle and captures/records that date by photographic, microphotographic, video tape or other recording system and produces an image of a motor vehicle at the moment that it exceeds the speed limit; provides for the expiration of this demonstration program five years after the effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Assembly | print number 7737a |
2012-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07481 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION