NY A07736 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons designated as peace officers; adds employees of the town of Deerpark serving as uniformed court officers at such town court to the list of persons who shall have the powers of, and shall be peace officers.
Title
Relates to persons designated as peace officers; adds employees of the town of Deerpark serving as uniformed court officers at such town court to the list of persons who shall have the powers of, and shall be peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.243 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5977 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.576 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.576 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05977 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7736